THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 02:48:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-795 Gardiners Rd
Kingston ON K7M 7E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 544 3400
Fax: 613 545 2204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 25 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J M Lakoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lakoff (CPSO#: 94866 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-5400 Extn: 3212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-795 Gardiners Rd
Kingston ON K7M 7E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 544 3400
Fax: 613 545 2204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 25 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J M Lakoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lakoff (CPSO#: 94866 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-5400 Extn: 3212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA MATTHEW LAKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA MATTHEW LAKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2011