THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 06:20:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Division of Nephrology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 3470
Fax: (905) 813-3830
Address: Credit Valley Medical Arts Building
2000 Credit Valley Road. Suite 310
Mississauga Ontario L5M4N4
Phone: 9059970096
Fax: 9058281147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Jan 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Hashim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hashim (CPSO#: 94882 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Critical Care Unit
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Division of Nephrology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 3470
Fax: (905) 813-3830
Address: Credit Valley Medical Arts Building
2000 Credit Valley Road. Suite 310
Mississauga Ontario L5M4N4
Phone: 9059970096
Fax: 9058281147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Jan 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Mar 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Hashim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hashim (CPSO#: 94882 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Critical Care Unit
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jul 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 29 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Shahzad Hashim may practice medicine independently in internal
medicine and nephrology.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Shahzad Hashim may practice medicine independently in internal
medicine and nephrology.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2011