THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:09:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9N-950, 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 6529
Fax: 416-340-4556

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Donahoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Donahoe (CPSO#: 94896 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N-985
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6529
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
9N-950
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
416-340-4800 Extn: 6529

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9N-950, 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 6529
Fax: 416-340-4556

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Donahoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Donahoe (CPSO#: 94896 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N-985
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6529
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
9N-950
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
416-340-4800 Extn: 6529

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA LYNN DONAHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHOE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA LYNN DONAHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHOE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2011