THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:52:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 512 Oxford St E
Rouhani Medical
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Apr 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nassim Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rouhani (CPSO#: 94899 )
Business Address: 512 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
(519) 601-6601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 512 Oxford St E
Rouhani Medical
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Apr 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nassim Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rouhani (CPSO#: 94899 )
Business Address: 512 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 3H7
(519) 601-6601

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Sep 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 13 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nassim Rouhani may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nassim Rouhani may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2011