THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:07:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Queen's Plate Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2552
Fax: (416) 741-9729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miriam Ang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ang (CPSO#: 94946 )
Business Address: 110 Queens Plate Drive
Suite A
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
(416) 741-2552

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Queen's Plate Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2552
Fax: (416) 741-9729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miriam Ang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ang (CPSO#: 94946 )
Business Address: 110 Queens Plate Drive
Suite A
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
(416) 741-2552

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRIAM ANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRIAM ANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2011