THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:06:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Center
Suite 102
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 935-8044
Fax: (807) 698 6399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 May 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan (CPSO#: 95040 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
Suite 201
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Address: 102-984 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
807-935-8044

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Center
Suite 102
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 935-8044
Fax: (807) 698 6399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 May 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan (CPSO#: 95040 )
Business Address: Medical Centre
Suite 201
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Address: 102-984 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
807-935-8044

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 28 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AYMAN EMAM HASSANIEN HASSAN may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AYMAN EMAM HASSANIEN HASSAN may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 May 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 May 2011