THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:59:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3780 14th Avenue
Suite 311 and 314
Markham Ontario L3R 4B7
Phone: 4165038282
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2109 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 1N1
Phone: 4167452400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha M. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fernandes (CPSO#: 95059 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(416) 659-4928

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3780 14th Avenue
Suite 311 and 314
Markham Ontario L3R 4B7
Phone: 4165038282
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2109 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 1N1
Phone: 4167452400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha M. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fernandes (CPSO#: 95059 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(416) 659-4928

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHA MARIA FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHA MARIA FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011