THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:29:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room C2-168
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1329 Fuller Street
London Ontario N5Y 4R1
Phone: 226-268-2968
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NS Ludwig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ludwig (CPSO#: 95063 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room C2-168
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1329 Fuller Street
London Ontario N5Y 4R1
Phone: 226-268-2968
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NS Ludwig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ludwig (CPSO#: 95063 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN SCOTT LUDWIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUDWIG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN SCOTT LUDWIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUDWIG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 May 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011