THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 14:04:31 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
L L 02
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6846
Fax: (705) 740-6847
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marta Wesolowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wesolowski (CPSO#: 95072 )
Business Address: PRHC
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
LL 02
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6846

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
L L 02
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 740-6846
Fax: (705) 740-6847
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marta Wesolowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wesolowski (CPSO#: 95072 )
Business Address: PRHC
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
LL 02
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 740-6846

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA ANNA WESOLOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESOLOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA ANNA WESOLOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESOLOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2011