THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lai (CPSO#: 95086 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
L122
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-5263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lai (CPSO#: 95086 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
L122
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-5263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN SIU WUAN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN SIU WUAN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011