THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:58:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Thames Hall, Room 2170
Western University
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-661-3030
Fax: 519-661-3380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Petis L McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Petis (CPSO#: 95410 ) Dr. L. McAuley (CPSO#: 95106 )
Business Address: Western University
UCC - Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030
Business Address: Suite 104
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0B8
(519) 533-6970

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Thames Hall, Room 2170
Western University
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-661-3030
Fax: 519-661-3380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Petis L McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Petis (CPSO#: 95410 ) Dr. L. McAuley (CPSO#: 95106 )
Business Address: Western University
UCC - Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030
Business Address: Suite 104
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0B8
(519) 533-6970

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEANNE MICHELLE MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEANNE MICHELLE MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011