THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:13:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 309
383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 724-5852
Fax: (613) 724-9965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Horne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horne (CPSO#: 95113 )
Business Address: Suite 309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R4
(613) 724-5852

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 309
383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 724-5852
Fax: (613) 724-9965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Horne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horne (CPSO#: 95113 )
Business Address: Suite 309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R4
(613) 724-5852

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID HORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID HORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011