THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:04:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10376 Yonge St
Unit # 106
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-237-0165
Fax: 905-237-0153
Address: 5-10288 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Phone: 905-237-8630
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sogand Gholami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gholami (CPSO#: 95130 )
Business Address: 10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B2
(905) 237-8755
Business Address: 106-10376 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
905-237-0165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10376 Yonge St
Unit # 106
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-237-0165
Fax: 905-237-0153
Address: 5-10288 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Phone: 905-237-8630
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sogand Gholami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gholami (CPSO#: 95130 )
Business Address: 10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B2
(905) 237-8755
Business Address: 106-10376 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
905-237-0165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOGAND GHOLAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOGAND GHOLAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011