THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: McFadden, Nicole Catherine (Used Until: 25 Sep 2013)
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 2448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 786 Blackburn Mews
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: 613-389-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 27 Aug 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. King (CPSO#: 95182 )
Business Address: 786 Blackburn Mews
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
613-389-7400
Business Address: 8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: QHC Prince Edward County Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-1008
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

General Information

Former Name: McFadden, Nicole Catherine (Used Until: 25 Sep 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 2448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 786 Blackburn Mews
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: 613-389-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 27 Aug 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. King (CPSO#: 95182 )
Business Address: 786 Blackburn Mews
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
613-389-7400
Business Address: 8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: QHC Prince Edward County Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-1008
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE CATHERINE KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE CATHERINE KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011