THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:06:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital Urogynecology Clinic
SEGWHC
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-738-8400
Extension: 81725
Fax: 613-738-8524
Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Obstetrics Clinic (Civic)
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-761-4522
Fax: 613-761-5141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aisling Clancy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Clancy (CPSO#: 95188 )
Business Address: 106-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
613-761-9292
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Urogynecology Clinic
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
613-738-8400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital Urogynecology Clinic
SEGWHC
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-738-8400
Extension: 81725
Fax: 613-738-8524
Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Obstetrics Clinic (Civic)
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-761-4522
Fax: 613-761-5141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aisling Clancy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Clancy (CPSO#: 95188 )
Business Address: 106-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
613-761-9292
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Urogynecology Clinic
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
613-738-8400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISLING ANNE CLANCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLANCY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISLING ANNE CLANCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLANCY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011