THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
Unit 104
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: (613) 771-0689

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Pincock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pincock (CPSO#: 95192 )
Business Address: Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
Unit 104
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
(613) 771-3389

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
Unit 104
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: (613) 771-0689

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Pincock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pincock (CPSO#: 95192 )
Business Address: Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
Unit 104
145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 2S9
(613) 771-3389

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES PINCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINCOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES PINCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINCOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2011