THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:59:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Kirandeep (Used Until: 04 Feb 2018)
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162421000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Urgent Medical Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KIRAN MIXA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mixa (CPSO#: 95193 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8

Corporation Name: Kiran Mixa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Neel Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2016

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Kirandeep (Used Until: 04 Feb 2018)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162421000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Urgent Medical Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KIRAN MIXA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mixa (CPSO#: 95193 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8

Corporation Name: Kiran Mixa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Neel Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2016

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jul 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 12 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kirandeep Singh may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kirandeep Singh may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2011