THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:58:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate, Oakville, ON
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kazem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kazem (CPSO#: 95195 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate, Oakville, ON
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kazem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kazem (CPSO#: 95195 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAREK KAZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAREK KAZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011