THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 59065-1559 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-518-4008
Fax: (343)888-2626

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Regine Krechowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krechowicz (CPSO#: 95197 )
Business Address: 316-2647 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7T5
(613) 680-8747
Business Address: 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Unit 59065
Ottawa ON K1G 0E9
613-518-4008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 59065-1559 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-518-4008
Fax: (343)888-2626

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Regine Krechowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krechowicz (CPSO#: 95197 )
Business Address: 316-2647 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7T5
(613) 680-8747
Business Address: 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Unit 59065
Ottawa ON K1G 0E9
613-518-4008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REGINE JEANETTE KRECHOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRECHOWICZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REGINE JEANETTE KRECHOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRECHOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011