THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 16:33:22 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nirosala Murugesupillai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Murugesupillai (CPSO#: 95205 )
Business Address: Glazier Medical Center
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1212 Extn: 308

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nirosala Murugesupillai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Murugesupillai (CPSO#: 95205 )
Business Address: Glazier Medical Center
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1212 Extn: 308

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIROSALA MURUGESUPILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURUGESUPILLAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIROSALA MURUGESUPILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURUGESUPILLAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011