THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:39:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Phone: 7055493181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathai-Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mathai (CPSO#: 95206 ) Dr. I. Wagg (CPSO#: 90903 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 549-3181
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Phone: 7055493181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathai-Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mathai (CPSO#: 95206 ) Dr. I. Wagg (CPSO#: 90903 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 549-3181
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANILA SUSAN MATHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANILA SUSAN MATHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011