THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 386 Huron Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-216-9878
Fax: 705-216-9878
Address: Taddle Creek Home Visiting Program
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
790 Bay Street, Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 585-9555
Fax: (416) 585-5815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.E. McMurren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McMurren (CPSO#: 95217 )
Business Address: Primarycare@Home Program
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Suite 302
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 585-9555
Business Address: 386 Huron Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G6
705-216-9878

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 386 Huron Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-216-9878
Fax: 705-216-9878
Address: Taddle Creek Home Visiting Program
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
790 Bay Street, Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 585-9555
Fax: (416) 585-5815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.E. McMurren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McMurren (CPSO#: 95217 )
Business Address: Primarycare@Home Program
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Suite 302
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 585-9555
Business Address: 386 Huron Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G6
705-216-9878

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHASE EVERETT MCMURREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMURREN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHASE EVERETT MCMURREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMURREN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011