THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:43:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit # 16
St. George Medical Center
585 Ontario Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693 0044
Fax: (905) 693 8600
Address: 50 Skyharbour Drive Unit 9
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0C1
Phone: 9058136886
Fax: 9058136889

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherine Naguib Khela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naguib Khela (CPSO#: 95227 )
Business Address: 9 - 50 Skyharbour Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0C1
(905) 813-6886
Business Address: 5980 Churchill Meadows Boulevard
Unit 3
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M5
(905) 814-1342
Business Address: 16 - 585 Ontario Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2N2
(905) 693-0044

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit # 16
St. George Medical Center
585 Ontario Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693 0044
Fax: (905) 693 8600
Address: 50 Skyharbour Drive Unit 9
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0C1
Phone: 9058136886
Fax: 9058136889

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherine Naguib Khela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naguib Khela (CPSO#: 95227 )
Business Address: 9 - 50 Skyharbour Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0C1
(905) 813-6886
Business Address: 5980 Churchill Meadows Boulevard
Unit 3
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M5
(905) 814-1342
Business Address: 16 - 585 Ontario Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2N2
(905) 693-0044

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERINE AMIN SOBHY NAGUIB KHELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGUIB KHELA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERINE AMIN SOBHY NAGUIB KHELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGUIB KHELA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011