THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:30:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-941-7575
Fax: 519-941-7060
Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clendinning and French Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clendinning (CPSO#: 95312 ) Dr. R. French (CPSO#: 95245 )
Business Address: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Upper Level
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-941-7575
Fax: 519-941-7060
Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clendinning and French Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clendinning (CPSO#: 95312 ) Dr. R. French (CPSO#: 95245 )
Business Address: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Upper Level
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RETA ANNE FRENCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRENCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RETA ANNE FRENCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRENCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011