THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Community Health Centre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 754-0777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St, Brantford, ON
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra M. George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. George (CPSO#: 95246 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Grand River Community Health Centre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-0777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Community Health Centre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 754-0777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St, Brantford, ON
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra M. George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. George (CPSO#: 95246 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Grand River Community Health Centre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-0777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA MARIE GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA MARIE GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011