THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:09:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Wing Family Medical Clinic
95 Manston Cres
Hornell Heights Ontario P0H 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-494-2149
Fax: 18332679904
Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Dr
PO Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rappaport (CPSO#: 95258 )
Business Address: 22 Wing Family Medical Clinic
95 Manston Crescent
North Bay Ontario P0H 1P0
(705) 494-2149
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
P.O. Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Wing Family Medical Clinic
95 Manston Cres
Hornell Heights Ontario P0H 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-494-2149
Fax: 18332679904
Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Dr
PO Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rappaport (CPSO#: 95258 )
Business Address: 22 Wing Family Medical Clinic
95 Manston Crescent
North Bay Ontario P0H 1P0
(705) 494-2149
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
P.O. Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA VERNA RAPPAPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPPAPORT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA VERNA RAPPAPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPPAPORT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011