THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:16:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Mill Street East, Unit 5
Tottenham Ontario L0G 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 936-3331
Fax: (905) 936-3232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 95262 )
Business Address: Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S8
(705) 435-8887
Business Address: 120 Mill Street East
Unit 5
Tottenham Ontario L0G 1W0
(905) 936-3331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Mill Street East, Unit 5
Tottenham Ontario L0G 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 936-3331
Fax: (905) 936-3232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 95262 )
Business Address: Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S8
(705) 435-8887
Business Address: 120 Mill Street East
Unit 5
Tottenham Ontario L0G 1W0
(905) 936-3331

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH JOANNE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH JOANNE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011