THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:09:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaroslav Christopher Fabian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fabian (CPSO#: 95278 )
Business Address: The Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaroslav Christopher Fabian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fabian (CPSO#: 95278 )
Business Address: The Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAROSLAV CHRISTOPHER FABIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FABIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAROSLAV CHRISTOPHER FABIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FABIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011