THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Discovery Family Health
77 Provost Drive
North York Ontario M2K 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 901-7407
Fax: 4169019780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eva Knifed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Knifed (CPSO#: 95282 )
Business Address: 77 Provost Dr
North York ON M2K 0B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Discovery Family Health
77 Provost Drive
North York Ontario M2K 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 901-7407
Fax: 4169019780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eva Knifed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Knifed (CPSO#: 95282 )
Business Address: 77 Provost Dr
North York ON M2K 0B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA KNIFED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIFED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA KNIFED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIFED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011