THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ziauddin Medical University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A13-9600 Islington Ave
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058938085
Fax: 9058938218
Address: 2180 Speakman Dr
Mississauga ON L5K 0B1
Phone: 9053692442
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atika Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider (CPSO#: 95297 )
Business Address: Unit 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 623-0323
Business Address: 9600 Islington Ave
UnitA13
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T1
9058938085

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Ziauddin Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A13-9600 Islington Ave
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058938085
Fax: 9058938218
Address: 2180 Speakman Dr
Mississauga ON L5K 0B1
Phone: 9053692442
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atika Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider (CPSO#: 95297 )
Business Address: Unit 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 623-0323
Business Address: 9600 Islington Ave
UnitA13
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T1
9058938085

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATIKA HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATIKA HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ziauddin Medical University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011