THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 06:01:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5076
Fax: (705) 876-5160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carole Lazaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lazaro (CPSO#: 95298 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Hospital Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5076

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5076
Fax: (705) 876-5160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carole Lazaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lazaro (CPSO#: 95298 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Hospital Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5076

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE ANNIE LAZARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZARO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE ANNIE LAZARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZARO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011