THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph Ontario N1G 5J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 823-5133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandeep Deol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Deol (CPSO#: 95301 )
Business Address: Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph Ontario N1G 5J5
(519) 823-5133

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph Ontario N1G 5J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 823-5133
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandeep Deol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Deol (CPSO#: 95301 )
Business Address: Arbour Family Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph Ontario N1G 5J5
(519) 823-5133

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDEEP KAUR DEOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDEEP KAUR DEOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011