THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. A. Katarey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Katarey (CPSO#: 95307 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. A. Katarey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Katarey (CPSO#: 95307 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEEL ANAND KATAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATAREY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEEL ANAND KATAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATAREY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011