THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:19:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pain Care Clinics
6981 Millcreek Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 111 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
Phone: 2893161645
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ravdeep Kukreja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kukreja (CPSO#: 95310 )
Business Address: 6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pain Care Clinics
6981 Millcreek Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 111 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
Phone: 2893161645
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ravdeep Kukreja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kukreja (CPSO#: 95310 )
Business Address: 6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVDEEP KUKREJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKREJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVDEEP KUKREJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKREJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011