THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:53:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Professional Building
679 Davis Drive
Unit 204
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-8881
Fax: 905-235-8861
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Diabetes Education Centre
The Tannery Mall
465 Davis Drive, Suite 213
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 7T9
Phone: (905)895-4521
Extension: 5650
Fax: (905)853-3180

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robina Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rana (CPSO#: 95315 )
Business Address: Suite 204
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 235-8881
Business Address: Diabetes Education Centre
213-465 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 7T9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 5600
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Professional Building
679 Davis Drive
Unit 204
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 235-8881
Fax: 905-235-8861
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Diabetes Education Centre
The Tannery Mall
465 Davis Drive, Suite 213
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 7T9
Phone: (905)895-4521
Extension: 5650
Fax: (905)853-3180

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robina Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rana (CPSO#: 95315 )
Business Address: Suite 204
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 235-8881
Business Address: Diabetes Education Centre
213-465 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 7T9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 5600
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBINA IFTIKHAR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBINA IFTIKHAR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011