THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 22:28:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: K-W Cardiopulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)741 5252
Fax: (519) 741 5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 17 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: U Manian S Suppiah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Manian (CPSO#: 95317 ) Dr. S. Suppiah (CPSO#: 96648 )
Business Address: 577 Sundew Dr
Business Address: 210-430 The Boardwalk

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: K-W Cardiopulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)741 5252
Fax: (519) 741 5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 17 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: U Manian S Suppiah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Manian (CPSO#: 95317 ) Dr. S. Suppiah (CPSO#: 96648 )
Business Address: 577 Sundew Dr
Business Address: 210-430 The Boardwalk

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA DEIVANAI MANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA DEIVANAI MANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011