THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:41:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sciences,Debrecen, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848-7100
Fax: 226-646-7846
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N1N8
Phone: 4162498111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abhishek Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Narayan (CPSO#: 95321 )
Business Address: 20 Fieldgate Street
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5K3
(519) 741-0221
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W1
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 7068
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Sciences,Debrecen, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848-7100
Fax: 226-646-7846
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N1N8
Phone: 4162498111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abhishek Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Narayan (CPSO#: 95321 )
Business Address: 20 Fieldgate Street
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5K3
(519) 741-0221
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2W1
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 7068
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHISHEK NARAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHISHEK NARAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sciences,Debrecen, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011