THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:19:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Huston St.
Box 550
Burks Falls ON P0A 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-382-4020
Fax: 705-382-3473
Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospit
100 Frank Miller Dr.
Huntsville Ontario P1H1H7
Phone: 7057892311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hudson and Love Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Love (CPSO#: 95327 ) Dr. A. Hudson (CPSO#: 96066 )
Business Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: 203 - 348 Muskoka Road
3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-2145
Business Address: PO Box 550
150 Huston St
Burks Falls ON P0A 1C0
7053824020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Huston St.
Box 550
Burks Falls ON P0A 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-382-4020
Fax: 705-382-3473
Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospit
100 Frank Miller Dr.
Huntsville Ontario P1H1H7
Phone: 7057892311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hudson and Love Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Love (CPSO#: 95327 ) Dr. A. Hudson (CPSO#: 96066 )
Business Address: Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: 203 - 348 Muskoka Road
3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-2145
Business Address: PO Box 550
150 Huston St
Burks Falls ON P0A 1C0
7053824020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA MARGARET KATHLEEN LOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA MARGARET KATHLEEN LOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011