THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:07:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Medical Centre
PO box 430
Lincoln Ontario L0R 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-563-5315
Fax: 905-563-0933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Rycroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rycroft (CPSO#: 95335 )
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Medical Centre
PO box 430
Lincoln Ontario L0R 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-563-5315
Fax: 905-563-0933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Rycroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rycroft (CPSO#: 95335 )
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH RYCROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYCROFT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH RYCROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYCROFT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011