THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 9
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax Ontario L1T 0K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 426-5050
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 New Delhi drive Unit 78
Markham Ontario L3S 0B5
Phone: 905-294-4489
Fax: 905-294-4479

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nirmala Gengatharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gengatharan (CPSO#: 95352 )
Business Address: 1801 Harwood Avenue North
Suite 9
Ajax Ontario L1T 0K8
(905) 426-5050
Business Address: 78 - 20 New Delhi Drive
Markham Ontario L3S 0B5
(905) 249-4489

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 9
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax Ontario L1T 0K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 426-5050
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 New Delhi drive Unit 78
Markham Ontario L3S 0B5
Phone: 905-294-4489
Fax: 905-294-4479

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nirmala Gengatharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gengatharan (CPSO#: 95352 )
Business Address: 1801 Harwood Avenue North
Suite 9
Ajax Ontario L1T 0K8
(905) 426-5050
Business Address: 78 - 20 New Delhi Drive
Markham Ontario L3S 0B5
(905) 249-4489

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRMALA GENGATHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENGATHARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRMALA GENGATHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENGATHARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011