THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:13:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Ave
St. Peter’s Hospital
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-777-7877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Britta Laslo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Laslo (CPSO#: 95372 )
Business Address: 23 Ravenscliffe Ave
Hamilton ON L8P 3M3
9059298037

Corporation Name: Britta Laslo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Ave
St. Peter’s Hospital
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-777-7877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Britta Laslo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Laslo (CPSO#: 95372 )
Business Address: 23 Ravenscliffe Ave
Hamilton ON L8P 3M3
9059298037

Corporation Name: Britta Laslo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITTA CAMILLA CLAIRE LASLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITTA CAMILLA CLAIRE LASLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011