THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169788030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soraya Mumtaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mumtaz (CPSO#: 95396 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169788030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soraya Mumtaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mumtaz (CPSO#: 95396 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SORAYA SOFIA MUMTAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUMTAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SORAYA SOFIA MUMTAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUMTAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011