THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:22:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1403 29 Street Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2N 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 403-944-2129
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juan J. Russo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Russo (CPSO#: 95412 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7329
Business Address: 1403 29 Street Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2N 2T9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1403 29 Street Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2N 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 403-944-2129
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juan J. Russo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Russo (CPSO#: 95412 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7329
Business Address: 1403 29 Street Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2N 2T9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN JOSE RUSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN JOSE RUSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011