THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:28:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Colborne Street
Fenelon Falls Medical Centre
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K0M 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-887-5757
Fax: 705-887-9499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Pema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pema (CPSO#: 95419 )
Business Address: 205 Francis Street East
Box 849
Fenelon Falls Ontario K0M 1N0
(705) 887-4779
Business Address: 28 Colborne Street
P.O Box 458
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K0M 1N0
705-887-5757
Business Address: 28 Colborne Street
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K0M 1N0
705-887-5757

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Colborne Street
Fenelon Falls Medical Centre
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K0M 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-887-5757
Fax: 705-887-9499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Pema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pema (CPSO#: 95419 )
Business Address: 205 Francis Street East
Box 849
Fenelon Falls Ontario K0M 1N0
(705) 887-4779
Business Address: 28 Colborne Street
P.O Box 458
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K0M 1N0
705-887-5757
Business Address: 28 Colborne Street
Kawartha Lakes Ontario K0M 1N0
705-887-5757

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KESANG PEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KESANG PEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011