THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:59:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Rocca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rocca (CPSO#: 95429 )
Business Address: 5 Huntsmill Cres
Kingston ON K7L 4V1

Corporation Name: Nicole Rocca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Rocca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rocca (CPSO#: 95429 )
Business Address: 5 Huntsmill Cres
Kingston ON K7L 4V1

Corporation Name: Nicole Rocca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ANN ROCCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ANN ROCCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011