THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:02:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheung (CPSO#: 95457 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
9055768711 Extn: 77169

Corporation Name: Thomas Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheung (CPSO#: 95457 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
9055768711 Extn: 77169

Corporation Name: Thomas Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011