THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 13:06:42 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 2010
95 Meridian Avenue
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 672-3371
Fax: (705) 672-5900
Address: 421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: 705-647-8121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nichole Currie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Currie (CPSO#: 95467 )
Business Address: 95 Meridian Avenue
PO Box 2010
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
(705) 672-3371

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 2010
95 Meridian Avenue
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 672-3371
Fax: (705) 672-5900
Address: 421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: 705-647-8121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nichole Currie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Currie (CPSO#: 95467 )
Business Address: 95 Meridian Avenue
PO Box 2010
Haileybury Ontario P0J 1K0
(705) 672-3371

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA NICHOLE CURRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA NICHOLE CURRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011