THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:31:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lille II, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1188B Eglinton Ave W
Forest Hill Institute of Aesthetic Plastic Surgery
Toronto ON M6C 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167857864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 27 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr David Boudana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boudana (CPSO#: 95479 )
Business Address: 1188B Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 2E3
416-785-7864

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Lille II, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1188B Eglinton Ave W
Forest Hill Institute of Aesthetic Plastic Surgery
Toronto ON M6C 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167857864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 27 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr David Boudana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boudana (CPSO#: 95479 )
Business Address: 1188B Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 2E3
416-785-7864

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE BOUDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE BOUDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lille II, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011