THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins Family Health Team
Suite 250
123 3rd Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiersten Parr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Parr (CPSO#: 95486 )
Business Address: Timmins District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: Timmins Family Health Team
250-123 Third Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
(705) 264-1313

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins Family Health Team
Suite 250
123 3rd Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiersten Parr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Parr (CPSO#: 95486 )
Business Address: Timmins District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131
Business Address: Timmins Family Health Team
250-123 Third Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
(705) 264-1313

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIERSTEN JANE PARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIERSTEN JANE PARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011