THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sutherland, Jason (Used Until: 28 Jun 2011)
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 960 Notre Dame Ave
Unit C
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-560-1018
Fax: 705-566-7617
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. S. Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland (CPSO#: 95501 )
Business Address: 960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit C
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 560-1018
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: Sutherland, Jason (Used Until: 28 Jun 2011)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 960 Notre Dame Ave
Unit C
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-560-1018
Fax: 705-566-7617
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. S. Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland (CPSO#: 95501 )
Business Address: 960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit C
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 560-1018
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON SCOTT SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON SCOTT SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011